ND HB1149 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the industrial commission for liquefied natural gas pilot project grants; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the industrial commission for liquefied natural gas pilot project grants; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 86 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |