ND 1148 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-10.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electric bicycle regulations, manufacturing, and operations; to amend and reenact sections 39-01-01, 39-05-02.2, and 39-10.1-08, subsection 5 of section 39-16-01, subsection 2 of section 39-29-01, and subsection 2 of section 57-40.3-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the requirements for electric bicycles distributed, manufactured, and operated in the state; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The requirements for electric bicycles distributed, manufactured, and operated in the state; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-04-15SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 1
2021-04-13HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-09HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Dwyer Fors Conley
2021-04-05HouseAppoint Rep. Becker to replace Rep. Paur on conference committee
2021-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Paur Christensen Hanson
2021-04-01HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 9
2021-03-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2021-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-01SenateReceived from House
2021-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1
2021-01-22HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1148.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-02003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-02004a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0508-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-17.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-51.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-64.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback