ND HB1147 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-52.1-04.19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee fertility health benefits; to amend and reenact section 26.1-36.6-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Self-insurance health plans; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] |
Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 31 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63 |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 3 1 |
2021-02-10 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |