ND 1146 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 37-17.3-02.2 and section 37-17.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rulemaking authority of the statewide interoperability executive committee and eligibility for statewide interoperable radio network access; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rulemaking authority of the statewide interoperability executive committee and eligibility for statewide interoperable radio network access; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseSigned by Governor 03/17
2021-03-12HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-11SenateSigned by President
2021-03-10HouseReturned to House
2021-03-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback