ND 1144 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to protect free speech from racial, religious, and viewpoint discrimination by a social media platform or interactive computer service; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to protect free speech from racial, religious, and viewpoint discrimination by a social media platform or interactive computer service; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
2021-03-31SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-03-04SenateRereferred to Industry, Business and Labor
2021-03-04SenateRequest return from committee
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-23SenateReceived from House
2021-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 21
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 3 3
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback