ND 1141 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide a transfer to the innovation loan fund to support technology advancement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide a transfer to the innovation loan fund to support technology advancement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 14
2021-04-15HouseConcurred
2021-04-07HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2021-04-07SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-03-16SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-16SenateAmendment adopted
2021-03-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 03:15
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10
2021-02-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 2 2
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback