ND 1139 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 65-05-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duration limits for opioid therapy and benzodiazepine; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duration limits for opioid therapy and benzodiazepine; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-25SenateSigned by President
2021-03-24HouseReturned to House
2021-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8
2021-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-28SenateReceived from House
2021-01-27HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 26
2021-01-21HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback