ND 1137 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an individual income tax credit for charitable contributions; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An individual income tax credit for charitable contributions; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/12
2021-04-08HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by President
2021-04-01HouseReturned to House
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16
2021-03-30SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-10SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-10SenateReported back, do pass 5 2 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-04SenateReceived from House
2021-02-03HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 14
2021-02-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 2 0
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
2021-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback