ND 1137 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 26.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic delivery of insurance notices and documents; and to repeal section 26.1-39-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic delivery of property and casualty insurance notices and documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic delivery of property and casualty insurance notices and documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseSigned by Governor 03/20
2019-03-15HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-14SenateSigned by President
2019-03-13HouseReturned to House
2019-03-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-03-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-04SenateReceived from House
2019-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2019-01-29HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-28HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-14HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback