ND 1137 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 65-04-26.2 and 65-04-27.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation requirements for general contractors and cease and desist orders; to amend and reenact subsection 16 of section 65-01-02 and section 65-04-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workers' compensation definition of employee, assignment of rate classification, and calculation of premium; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The workers' compensation definition of employee, assignment of rate classification, and calculation of premium; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-04-05HouseConcurred
2017-03-22HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-21SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2017-01-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-12HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback