ND 1137 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 6-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of the capital infrastructure revolving loan fund; to amend and reenact sections 6-09.4-06, 6-09.4-10, and 6-09.4-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of the capital infrastructure revolving loan fund; to provide for a transfer; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of the capital infrastructure revolving loan fund; to provide for a transfer; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-26HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 79
2015-02-24HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 22 1 0
2015-02-02HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2015-02-02HouseAmendment adopted
2015-01-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2015-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback