ND 1137 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-10-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to audits of occupational and professional boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audits of occupational and professional boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 04/01
2013-04-01HouseSent to Governor
2013-03-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-21SenateSigned by President
2013-03-11HouseReturned to House
2013-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2013-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2013-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2013-02-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2013-01-31SenateReceived from House
2013-01-30HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2013-01-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-01-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2
2013-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback