ND 1137 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 41-09-132, 41-09-133, 41-09-134, 41-09-135, 41-09-136, 41-09-137, 41-09-138, and 41-09-139 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transition provision for revision of secured transaction laws; to amend and reenact sections 41-09-02 and 41-09-05, subdivision b of subsection 6 of section 41-09-27, subsection 1 of section 41-09-31, sections 41-09-36, 41-09-37, and 41-09-46, subsection 5 of section 41-09-68, subsection 2 of section 41-09-70, subdivision c of subsection 3 of section 41-09-73, section 41-09-74, subsection 3 of section 41-09-78, subsection 6 of section 41-09-86, subsection 2 of section 41-09-87, section 41-09-89, and paragraph 1 of subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 41-09-104 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a revision to Uniform Commercial Code Article 9 relating to secured transactions; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A revision to Uniform Commercial Code Article 9 relating to secured transactions; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-14 Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
2011-04-05 Signed by Governor 04/04
2011-04-01 Signed by Speaker
2011-03-17 Signed by President
2011-03-15 Returned to House
2011-03-14 Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2011-03-10 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2011-02-08 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-03 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2011-01-24 Received from House
2011-01-21 Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2011-01-19 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
2011-01-19 Committee Hearing 08:00
2011-01-04 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback