ND HB1134 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 4.1-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial feed and prohibited acts; to amend and reenact sections 4.1-41-01, 4.1-41-02, 4.1-41-04, 4.1-41-05, 4.1-41-06, 4.1-41-07, 4.1-41-09, 4.1-41-10, 4.1-41-11, 4.1-41-13, 4.1-41-16, and 4.1-41-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial feed; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Commercial feed; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |