ND 1131 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to credentials for specialists trained in dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credentials for specialists trained in dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/01
2021-03-31HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-30SenateSigned by President
2021-03-29HouseReturned to House
2021-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2021-03-25SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-01-18SenateReceived from House
2021-01-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2021-01-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-13HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback