ND HB1131 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempting the sale of commemorative memorial coins from sales tax; to amend and reenact section 37-18-12 and subsection 2 of section 37-18-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to funding authority of the department of veterans' affairs and veteran commemorative coins; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Funding authority of the department of veterans' affairs and veteran commemorative coins; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 7 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |