ND 1129 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 57-38-01.28 and subdivision t of subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the marriage penalty credit and an income tax exclusion for social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The marriage penalty credit and an income tax exclusion for social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 26
2021-04-05SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-24SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-24SenateReported back, do pass 7 0 0
2021-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-04SenateReceived from House
2021-02-03HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1
2021-02-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 0
2021-01-29HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-28HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-28HouseAmendment adopted
2021-01-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
2021-01-21HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-01-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback