ND HB1129 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 1, 5, and 6 of section 39-06.2-10.6, section 39-06.2-10.7, subsections 1, 5, and 6 of section 39-20-05, and section 39-20-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hearing requirements for commercial vehicles and for commercial and noncommercial driver's licenses.
Title
Hearing requirements for commercial vehicles and for commercial and noncommercial driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2 |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |