ND HB1128 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-10-21.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting entering or driving on a closed road; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prohibiting entering or driving on a closed road; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 65 |
2021-01-18 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-15 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |