ND HB1127 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 44-08-05.1 and 54-10-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disclosure of a pending investigation.
Title
The disclosure of a pending investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/31 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 31 |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |