ND 1124 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 5-01-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to evidence-based alcohol and drug education program for individuals under twenty-one years of age who purchase, possess, or consume an alcoholic beverage; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidence-based alcohol and drug education program for individuals under twenty-one years of age who purchase, possess, or consume an alcoholic beverage; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-26SenateSigned by President
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-03-23SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-02SenateReceived from House
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
2021-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback