ND HB1122 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 12-63-02.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reserve peace officers; and to amend and reenact section 12-63-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to peace officer duties or activities.
Title
Peace officer duties or activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |