ND HB1122 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the secretary of state for the procurement and implementation of electronic pollbooks to be utilized statewide in all polling places; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the secretary of state for the procurement and implementation of electronic pollbooks to be utilized statewide in all polling places; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 72 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 16 1 4 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |