ND HB1121 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 39 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 39 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 14-05-24 and 14-05-27 and subsection 3 of section 29-15-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to division of marital property debts; and to provide for application.
Title
Division of marital property debts; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 39 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 39 nays 49 |
2021-01-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |