ND HB1120 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to authorize the state board of higher education to convey the arts building at Dickinson state university; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to authorize the state board of higher education to convey the arts building at Dickinson state university; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Jay Elkin [R] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 0 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |