ND 1118 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 37-17.1-05 and a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the governor's authority to issue executive orders and permitting a virtual meeting of the legislative management and a virtual session of the legislative assembly during a declared disaster or emergency; to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 23-01-05 and subsection 3 of section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of the state health officer and the gubernatorial declaration of disaster or emergency; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The authority of the state health officer and the gubernatorial declaration of disaster or emergency; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-20SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 3, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-16HouseConcurred
2021-04-12HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-12SenateEmergency clause carried
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-04-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-08SenateReceived from House
2021-02-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback