ND HB1117 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 25-03.1-03.1, 25-03.1-06, 25-03.1-08, 25-03.1-15, and 25-03.1-19, subsection 2 of section 25-03.1-21, and sections 25-03.1-22, 25-03.1-23, and 25-03.1-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commitment procedures.
Title
Commitment procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dwyer Fors Bakke |
2021-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Roers Jones Karls Buffalo |
2021-04-05 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |