ND 1113 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 18 of section 19-03.1-01, section 19-03.1-05, subsection 7 of section 19-03.1-07, subsection 4 of section 19-03.1-09, subsection 7 of section 19-03.1-11, and subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of marijuana and the scheduling of controlled substances; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of marijuana and the scheduling of controlled substances; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by President
2019-04-03HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2019-04-03HouseConcurred
2019-03-04HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-01SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-03-01SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-02-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-17SenateReceived from House
2019-01-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2019-01-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-01-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:50
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback