ND 1111 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to provide for a legislative management study of competency-based learning initiatives implemented in school districts under innovative education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to provide for a legislative management study of competency-based learning initiatives implemented in school districts under innovative education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseSigned by Governor 03/15
2021-03-10HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-08HouseReturned to House
2021-03-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-03-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-01-18SenateReceived from House
2021-01-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2021-01-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback