ND HB1110 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 25-03.1-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to petitions for continuing treatment orders.
Title
Petitions for continuing treatment orders.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46 | |
2011-03-29 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-03-08 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Received from House | |
2011-01-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 | |
2011-01-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |