ND HB1110 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 36-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to feral swine; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 36-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to feral swine; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-22 | Second reading, passed, yeas 072 nays 019 | |
2009-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Wanzek Flakoll Heckaman | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Wall Uglem Boe | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-11 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 004 | |
2009-02-05 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 001 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1110.html |