ND 1104 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-32-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sentencing violent offenders; to provide for application; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing violent offenders; to provide for application; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
2021-01-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-20HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 2
2021-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback