ND 1104 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-01-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the governor's authority to call out the national guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The governor's authority to call out the national guard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House of Representatives - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03HouseSigned by Governor 03/02
2017-03-01HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-01SenateSigned by President
2017-02-23HouseReturned to House
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-02SenateReceived from House
2017-01-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14
2017-01-09HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
2017-01-05HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback