ND 1102 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 39-06-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to online driver's license renewals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online driver's license renewals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenateReceived from House
2021-01-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 7
2021-01-11HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0
2021-01-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback