ND HB1101 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 37-03-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the adjutant general's program supporting North Dakota national guard service members, veterans, families, and survivors, and the ability to accept funds for this purpose; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a report to the budget section.
Title
The adjutant general's program supporting North Dakota national guard service members, veterans, families, and survivors, and the ability to accept funds for this purpose; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a report to the budget section.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2019-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 7 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |