ND HB1097 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the nurse licensure compact; and to amend and reenact section 43-12.1-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks.
Title
Criminal history record checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2017-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |