ND HB1096 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 49-22-25, 49-22-26, 49-22.1-23, and 49-22.1-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to energy conversion and transmission siting and facilities; to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 49-22-03, section 49-22-07.2, subsections 1 and 4 of section 49-22-13, subsection 1 of section 49-22-22, subsections 3 and 7 of section 49-22.1-01, section 49-22.1-05, subsections 1 and 4 of section 49-22.1-10, and subsection 1 of section 49-22.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to energy conversion and transmission siting and facilities; and to repeal section 49-22.1-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to removal of electrical standards requirement from gas and liquid energy transmission facilities.
Title
Removal of electrical standards requirement from gas and liquid energy transmission facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bell Schaible Patten |
2021-04-06 | House | Conference committee appointed M. Ruby Marschall Zubke |
2021-04-06 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9 |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |