ND HB1092 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-04-26, 43-04-31, 43-04-32, 43-04-33, 43-04-35, 43-04-36, 43-04-39, 43-04-42, and 43-04-45 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the repeal of apprentice barbering requirements; and to repeal sections 43-04-22, 43-04-23, 43-04-28, 43-04-29, and 43-04-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the repeal of apprentice barbering requirements.
Title
The repeal of apprentice barbering requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Signed by Governor 03/02 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |