ND HB1092 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 15-20.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exemption of certain institutions from regulation by the state board for career and technical education; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15-20.4-03 and subsections 2 and 12 of section 43-12.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization to operate academic or professional postsecondary educational institutions and exemptions from the Nurse Practices Act.
Title
Authorization to operate academic or professional postsecondary educational institutions and exemptions from the Nurse Practices Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-12 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-11 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-01 | Conference committee appointed Schaible Flakoll Marcellais | |
2011-03-31 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-28 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-25 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Received from House | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1 | |
2011-01-11 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |