ND 1091 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 37-17.1-02.1 and 37-17.1-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the operations of the department of emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The operations of the department of emergency services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-01-17SenateReceived from House
2019-01-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2019-01-15HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-01-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback