ND HB1086 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Signed by Governor 03/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 65-05-08.1, subsection 1 of section 65-05-09.1, section 65-05-28, subsection 2 of section 65-05-33, and section 65-05.1-06.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice to treating doctor, social security offset, criminal offense for filing of false claim, and vocational rehabilitation pilot program reports; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Title
Notice to treating doctor, social security offset, criminal offense for filing of false claim, and vocational rehabilitation pilot program reports; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Signed by Governor 03/02 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4 |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |