ND 1085 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-34-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the drought disaster livestock water assistance program; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The drought disaster livestock water assistance program; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Agriculture Committee
2019-01-11SenateReceived from House
2019-01-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2019-01-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback