ND 1084 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-08, 39-04-10.4, and 39-04-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to number plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Number plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-11HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
2017-01-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
2017-01-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback