ND 1083 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.4 and 15.1-21-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to scholarship eligibility requirements; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scholarship eligibility requirements; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Governor 03/25
2021-03-24HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-23SenateSigned by President
2021-03-22HouseReturned to House
2021-03-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee
2021-01-18SenateReceived from House
2021-01-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-06HouseCommittee Hearing 01:45
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback