ND HB1083 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statutory and regulatory requirements placed on North Dakota state government agencies by United States government agencies.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statutory and regulatory requirements placed on North Dakota state government agencies by United States government agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16 |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |