ND 1081 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact sections 15-08-28, 15-08-29, 15-08-30, 15-08-31, and 15-08-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to and activities on trust lands; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to and activities on trust lands; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseSigned by Governor 03/29
2021-03-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-24SenateSigned by President
2021-03-23HouseReturned to House
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7
2021-03-19SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 25
2021-02-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-02-18HouseRereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2021-02-11HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback