ND HB1080 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Definition of wages and federal wages for national guard employees, biennial report requirements, out-of-state claim filing, discontinuation of benefits during incarceration, permanent partial impairment law for amputations, vocational consultants, and claimants; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 3 |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Laffen Sorvaag Sinner |
2013-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Ruby Frantsvog Gruchalla |
2013-04-05 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |