ND 1075 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 26.1-44-02, 26.1-44-03.1, 26.1-44-03.2, 26.1-44-06, 26.1-44-06.1, and 26.1-44-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to surplus lines insurance; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus lines insurance; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by Governor 03/08
2019-03-06HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-04HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-01SenateSigned by President
2019-02-28HouseReturned to House
2019-02-27SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-15SenateReceived from House
2019-01-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-01-11HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback