ND HB1060 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 52-04-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to surcharges paid by employers for employees who receive unemployment insurance benefits at a rate exceeding contributions paid into the system by the employer; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Surcharges paid by employers for employees who receive unemployment insurance benefits at a rate exceeding contributions paid into the system by the employer; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 13 |
2019-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |