ND HB1059 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 16.1-05-01 and subsection 4 of section 16.1-05-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to part-time appointment of election workers and required presence at polling places.
Title
Part-time appointment of election workers and required presence at polling places.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-01-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |